This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 06:56:27 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Ted Thao

Case Summary

On 08/24/2017 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ted Thao. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Bacciarini, Mark. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2828

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Bacciarini, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Thao, Ted

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vlachos, Michael

Ruiz, Abril

 

Court Documents

Summons

08/24/2017: Summons

Complaint

08/24/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/24/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service Summons

10/10/2017: Proof of Service Summons

Declaration

10/10/2017: Declaration

Request Entry of Default

03/05/2018: Request Entry of Default

Request Dismissal

03/05/2018: Request Dismissal

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

03/05/2018: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Declaration

03/05/2018: Declaration

Declaration

03/05/2018: Declaration

Declaration

03/05/2018: Declaration

Declaration

03/05/2018: Declaration

Declaration

03/05/2018: Declaration

Declaration

03/05/2018: Declaration

Declaration

03/05/2018: Declaration

Order

03/07/2018: Order

Judgment Default by Court

03/07/2018: Judgment Default by Court

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2018
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Discover Bank; Thao, Ted; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Discover Bank; Awarded Against; Thao, Ted; Amount; Damages: $6,178.60; Costs: $358.86; Total: $6537.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • FinancialDiscover Bank; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2017-13279; Discover Bank; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • FinancialDiscover Bank; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VLACHOS MICHAEL GEORGE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ruiz, Abril