This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/30/2020 at 01:28:58 (UTC).

Devonne Richie vs Alvin Pondexter

Case Summary

On 05/29/2015 Devonne Richie filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Alvin Pondexter. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Luna, Judy, Shaver, Donald and Seymour, Shelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1661

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Luna, Judy

Shaver, Donald

Seymour, Shelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Devonne Richie

Defendant

Alvin Pondexter

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Declaration

05/29/2015: Ex Parte Declaration

Temporary Restraining Order

05/29/2015: Temporary Restraining Order

Request for DVPA no Children

05/29/2015: Request for DVPA no Children

Notice Court Hearing

05/29/2015: Notice Court Hearing

* Public *

06/08/2015: * Public *

Response DVPA

06/17/2015: Response DVPA

Response DVPA

06/17/2015: Response DVPA

Restraining Order After Hearing

06/22/2015: Restraining Order After Hearing

Proof of Service by Mail

06/25/2015: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

06/25/2015: Proof of Service by Mail

Finding and Order After Hearing

07/07/2015: Finding and Order After Hearing

Restraining Order After Hearing

07/07/2015: Restraining Order After Hearing

* Public *

07/09/2015: * Public *

* Public *

07/09/2015: * Public *

Finding and Order After Hearing

09/15/2015: Finding and Order After Hearing

* Public *

09/16/2015: * Public *

* Public *

09/16/2015: * Public *

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinding and Order After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketChild Custody Recommending Counseling; Judicial Officer: Luna, Judy; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: CCRC Dropped From Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinding and Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketRestraining Order Contested; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse DVPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse DVPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketRequest Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketService of Request for Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Court Hearing; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for DVPA no Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less