Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/08/2021 at 18:01:41 (UTC).

Debbie Gomes vs Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, et al.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Debbie Gomes filed an Other lawsuit against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1166

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gomes, Debbie

Defendants

Serreta Properties, L.P.

Quality Loan Service Company, Inc.

JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Mace Properties, LLC.

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

 

Court Documents

Complaint

04/09/2021: Complaint

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

04/15/2021: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Summons - Filed

04/09/2021: Summons - Filed

Complaint

04/09/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/09/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialGomes, Debbie; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-01075; Gomes, Debbie; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialGomes, Debbie; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant