Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 21:41:31 (UTC).

David Kwong vs. Kevin Sarginson, et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2015 David Kwong filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Kevin Sarginson. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian and Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3019

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kwong, David

Defendants

Plaza, Jennifer L

Sarginson, Kevin F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Newman, William A

 

Court Documents

Judgment Default by Court

11/18/2015: Judgment Default by Court

Writ of Possession

11/13/2015: Writ of Possession

Affidavit

11/13/2015: Affidavit

Judgment Default by Clerk

11/13/2015: Judgment Default by Clerk

Request Dismissal

11/13/2015: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

11/13/2015: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

11/13/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

11/13/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

11/13/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Order

10/27/2015: Order

Request

10/27/2015: Request

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

10/21/2015: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

10/21/2015: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

10/21/2015: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

10/21/2015: Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

Complaint

10/19/2015: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Filed

10/19/2015: Summons - Filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; Kwong, David; Sarginson, Kevin F.; Plaza, Jennifer L; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • FinancialKwong, David; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-10502; Legal Support Net, Inc.; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • FinancialKwong, David; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • FinancialKwong, David; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-09651; Legal Support Net, Inci; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • FinancialKwong, David; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Kwong, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Newman, William A