This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/01/2021 at 13:20:13 (UTC).

Daniel Hurtado et al. vs Celine Bautista et al.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 Daniel Hurtado filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Celine Bautista. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian and Proietti, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0148

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

Proietti, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hurtado, Daniel

Hurtado, Maria

Hurtado, Sergio

Defendants

Winton School District

Bautista, Celine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abromson, Mark

Greenfield, Brett Alan

Defendant Attorneys

DeMaria, Anthony N.

Myers, Gregory L

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Statement

10/22/2020: Case Management Conference Statement

Notice

10/05/2020: Notice

Case Management Conference Statement

10/02/2020: Case Management Conference Statement

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

07/17/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

06/18/2020: Notice

Reply

06/17/2020: Reply

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

06/15/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Reply

06/08/2020: Reply

Opposition

05/20/2020: Opposition

Opposition

04/01/2020: Opposition

Opposition

04/01/2020: Opposition

Notice

03/26/2020: Notice

Declaration

03/23/2020: Declaration

Declaration

03/23/2020: Declaration

Notice

03/23/2020: Notice

Demurrer

03/23/2020: Demurrer

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

01/14/2020: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Summons.pdf

01/10/2020: Summons.pdf

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • FinancialBautista, Celine; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-25725; Bautista, Celine; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • FinancialBautista, Celine; Transaction Assessment; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • FinancialWinton School District; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-25119; Winton School District; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • FinancialWinton School District; Transaction Assessment; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • FinancialHurtado, Daniel; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-01192; Hurtado, Daniel; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • FinancialHurtado, Daniel; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENFIELD BRETT