This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/18/2022 at 17:10:06 (UTC).

CSPA Groundwater Cases # 21CV-01691 & 21CV-02127

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 CSPA Groundwater Cases 21CV-01691 21CV-02127 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol, Bacciarini, Mark and McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0203

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Bacciarini, Mark

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

California Sportfishing Protection Alliance

Defendants

Farmers Water District GSA

Del Puerto Water District

DM-II GSA

Oak Flat Water District GSA

San Joaquin River Exchange Contractors GSA

Aliso Water District GSA

Turner Island Water District GSA-2

Grassland Resource Conservation District

Grassland Water District

Widren Water District GSA

Oro Loma Water District GSA

Patterson Irrigation District

West Stanislaus Irrigation District

Delta-Mendota GSA

Merced County Delta-Mendota GSA

County of Merced

Northwestern Delta-Mendota GSA [Merced]

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lippe, Thomas N.

Kane, Nathaniel Hoopes

Defendant Attorneys

Grottveit, Ann M.

Doud, Alan F.

McClure, Andrew John

Marz, Jonathan R.

Amaral, Edward M.

Wehr, Ellen L.

George, Shawn M.

Zolezzi, Jeanne M.

Grant, Jeffrey B

Other Attorneys

Brenner, Barbara A

Tanaka, Gene

Linden, Michael R.

Marchini, Joseph M.

Vaughn, William A.

Sanchez, Giulio A

Lear, Matthew M.

Robertson, Kyle R.

 

Court Documents

3 16 2022 Not. Remote Appearance.pdf

03/16/2022: 3 16 2022 Not. Remote Appearance.pdf

Notice

03/16/2022: Notice

Notice

03/16/2022: Notice

Notice

03/15/2022: Notice

010 SENT St Merced Ntc Virtual Appear.pdf

03/14/2022: 010 SENT St Merced Ntc Virtual Appear.pdf

Notice of Remote Appearance

03/14/2022: Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice

03/14/2022: Notice

Separate Statement

03/11/2022: Separate Statement

Statement

03/11/2022: Statement

Consent

02/15/2022: Consent

FWD GSA Remote Proceedings Consent.pdf

02/15/2022: FWD GSA Remote Proceedings Consent.pdf

Order

02/10/2022: Order

Order

02/07/2022: Order

Order

02/07/2022: Order

Order

02/03/2022: Order

Order

02/03/2022: Order

Order

02/03/2022: Order

Order

02/03/2022: Order

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Attorney: Grottveit, Ann M.; Plaintiff; Attorney: Lippe, Thomas N.; Defendant; Attorney: Wehr, Ellen L.; Defendant; Attorney: Wehr, Ellen L.; Defendant; Attorney: George, Shawn M.; Defendant; Attorney: Zolezzi, Jeanne M.; Defendant; Attorney: Zolezzi, Jeanne M.; Defendant; County Counsel: Linden, Michael R.; Defendant; Attorney: Marchini, Joseph M.; Defendant; Attorney: Tanaka, Gene; Defendant; City Attorney: Vaughn, William A.; Defendant; Attorney: Sanchez, Giulio A; Defendant; County Counsel: Robertson, Kyle R.; Defendant; County Counsel: Robertson, Kyle R.; Defendant; Attorney: Zolezzi, Jeanne M.; Defendant; Attorney: Zolezzi, Jeanne M.; Defendant; Attorney: Wehr, Ellen L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSeparate Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where West Stanislaus Irrigation District is a litigant

Latest cases where Del Puerto Water District is a litigant

Latest cases where California Sportfishing Protection Alliance is a litigant