This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 16:18:54 (UTC).

County of Merced vs Josefina Salazar

Case Summary

On 01/15/2015 County of Merced filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Josefina Salazar. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bissig, Louis F. and Lo, Paul. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0129

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bissig, Louis F.

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County of Merced

Defendant

Salazar, Josefina Montoya

 

Court Documents

Claim - Plaintiff

01/15/2015: Claim - Plaintiff

Claim - Plaintiff

01/15/2015: Claim - Plaintiff

Certificate of Mailing re Josefina Salazar

01/15/2015: Certificate of Mailing re Josefina Salazar

Proof of Service

01/15/2015: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

02/23/2015: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

02/24/2015: Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment

04/14/2015: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Certificate of Mailing

04/14/2015: Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

04/14/2015: Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Entry of Judgment

04/20/2015: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Certificate Mailing

04/20/2015: Certificate Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

04/20/2015: Certificate of Mailing

Abstract of Judgment

05/28/2015: Abstract of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment

05/28/2015: Abstract of Judgment

Memorandum

05/28/2015: Memorandum

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2015
  • FinancialCounty of Merced; Government Exemption - GC6103; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • FinancialCounty of Merced; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Bissig, Louis F.; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; County of Merced; Salazar, Josefina Montoya; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; County of Merced; Awarded Against; Salazar, Josefina Montoya; Judgment Amount: $1,231.52; Amount; Damages: $1,138.02; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $93.50; Total: $1231.52; Comment: Plus court costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Bissig, Louis F.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: County of Merced

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • FinancialCounty of Merced; FTB Adjustment; $115.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • FinancialCounty of Merced; Transaction Assessment; $115.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • DocketPlaintiffs Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim - Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF MERCED is a litigant