This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 20:42:11 (UTC).

Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc., a Delaware Corporation vs Juan Toledo

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc , a Delaware Corporation filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Juan Toledo. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, David. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2460

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc., a Delaware Corporation

Defendants

Toledo, Maria T.

Toledo, Juan M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eaton, Luke N

Hack, Marion T.

Lee, Cindy J.

 

Court Documents

complaint.pdf

08/26/2020: complaint.pdf

cccs.pdf

08/26/2020: cccs.pdf

summons.pdf

08/26/2020: summons.pdf

Proof of Service Summons

09/17/2020: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

09/25/2020: Proof of Service Summons

Request Entry of Default

11/10/2020: Request Entry of Default

Request Dismissal

12/14/2020: Request Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal; Party; Names; Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc., a Delaware Corporation; Toledo, Juan M.; Toledo, Maria T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • FinancialConsolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc., a Delaware Corporation; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-22039; Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc., a Delaware Corporation; $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • FinancialConsolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc., a Delaware Corporation; Transaction Assessment; $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONSOLIDATED ELECTRICAL DISTRIBUTORS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eaton, Luke N.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marion Teresa Hack

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE CINDY JINA