This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 03:28:08 (UTC).

Conservatorship of:Noah Sanders

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 Conservatorship of Noah Sanders was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Proietti, Donald and McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0119

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Proietti, Donald

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Sanders, Shawn

Sanders, Debbie

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

04/01/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Petition Appoint Conservator Person

04/01/2020: Petition Appoint Conservator Person

Notice of Hearing

04/01/2020: Notice of Hearing

Citation Issued

04/01/2020: Citation Issued

Duties and Liabilities

04/01/2020: Duties and Liabilities

Waiver

04/01/2020: Waiver

Waiver

04/01/2020: Waiver

Order

04/24/2020: Order

Citation Filed

06/30/2020: Citation Filed

Proof of Service

06/30/2020: Proof of Service

Declaration

06/30/2020: Declaration

Declaration

06/30/2020: Declaration

Notice of Hearing

06/30/2020: Notice of Hearing

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

07/20/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Order Appointing Conservator-Person

07/21/2020: Order Appointing Conservator-Person

Letters Appoint Conservatorship

07/21/2020: Letters Appoint Conservatorship

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

01/25/2021: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketReview: Annual; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview: 6 Months; Original Type: Review: 6 Months; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Petitioner: Sanders, Shawn; Petitioner: Sanders, Debbie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCourt Invest Report & Recommend-Six-Month Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialSanders, Shawn; Fee Waiver; $47.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialSanders, Shawn; Transaction Assessment; $47.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters Appoint Conservatorship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Conservator-Person; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppointment of Conservator; Original Type: Appointment of Conservator; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Petitioner: Sanders, Shawn; Petitioner: Sanders, Debbie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCourt Investigator's Report & Recommendation Pre-Appointment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketConfidential Conservator Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketConfidential Conservator Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Appoint Conservator Person

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less