Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/15/2020 at 18:05:57 (UTC).

Conservatorship of: Else Baker

Case Summary

On 07/03/2014 Conservatorship of Else Baker was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirihara, John, Shaver, Donald and McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1665

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirihara, John

Shaver, Donald

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Merced County Public Conservator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hansen, Forrest W

 

Court Documents

Declaration

08/26/2015: Declaration

Order

08/26/2015: Order

Order

07/10/2015: Order

Notice of Hearing

06/12/2015: Notice of Hearing

Accounting - Subsequent Petition Filed

06/12/2015: Accounting - Subsequent Petition Filed

Investigator Report

06/12/2015: Investigator Report

Notice

06/12/2015: Notice

Order

04/20/2015: Order

PR-Public Historical

04/02/2015: PR-Public Historical

Notice of Hearing

03/20/2015: Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

03/13/2015: Notice of Hearing

Petition

03/13/2015: Petition

Change of Residence Notice

03/10/2015: Change of Residence Notice

Change of Residence Notice

01/22/2015: Change of Residence Notice

* Public *

11/17/2014: * Public *

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • FinancialMerced County Public Conservator; Government Exemption - GC6103; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • FinancialMerced County Public Conservator; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-07892; Merced County Public Conservator; $47.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • FinancialMerced County Public Conservator; Transaction Assessment; $482.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketAccounting; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Petitioner; Attorney: Hansen, Forrest W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAccounting - Subsequent Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInvestigator Report

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2014
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • DocketNotice Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • DocketCourt Invest Report & Recommend-First Year Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • DocketPetition Appoint Temporary Conservatorship Person

    Read MoreRead Less