Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 13:27:32 (UTC).

Conam Management Corporation vs. Maria Orozco

Case Summary

On 07/27/2015 Conam Management Corporation filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Maria Orozco. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian and Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2131

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conam Management Corporation

Defendants

Orozco, Maria Elena

Orozco, Maria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hrdlicka, Steve

 

Court Documents

Order

04/13/2016: Order

Declaration

04/07/2016: Declaration

Writ of Possession

09/15/2015: Writ of Possession

Judgment by Court

09/03/2015: Judgment by Court

Stipulation and Order

09/03/2015: Stipulation and Order

Notice of Court Trial

08/14/2015: Notice of Court Trial

Notice of Court Trial

08/14/2015: Notice of Court Trial

Request to Set

08/14/2015: Request to Set

Request Dismissal

08/07/2015: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

08/06/2015: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

08/06/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Answer

08/05/2015: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

08/05/2015: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

07/29/2015: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

Complaint

07/27/2015: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/27/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Filed

07/27/2015: Summons - Filed

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Court Judgment; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • FinancialConam Management Corporation; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-08541; Hrdlicka, Steve; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • FinancialConam Management Corporation; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment; Party; Names; Conam Management Corporation; Orozco, Maria Elena; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • FinancialConam Management Corporation; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-08219; Conam Management Corporation; $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • FinancialConam Management Corporation; Transaction Assessment; $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full; Judicial Officer: Authority, Administrative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • FinancialConam Management Corporation; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-06806; Hrdlicka, Steve; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • FinancialConam Management Corporation; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Conam Management Corporation; Served: 07/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ConAm Management Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hrdlicka, Steven R.