This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 00:25:41 (UTC).

Christopher Heffington, et al vs B & H Custom Homes, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 Christopher Heffington filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against B H Custom Homes, LLC. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian and Proietti, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2200

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

Proietti, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Branco, Kelsi

Long, Tiffany

Long, Christian

Heffington, Christopher

Defendants

Gonella Realty, Inc.

Krotik, Andrew

B & H Custom Homes, LLC

Houck, William

Coldwell Banker Gonella Realty

Bruns, Wayne

Lindo, Jacqueline

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sherron, Claudine

Defendant Attorneys

Horowitt, Darryl J

Johnston, David C

 

Court Documents

Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

01/04/2021: Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

Case Management Conference Statement

12/18/2020: Case Management Conference Statement

Case Management Conference Statement

12/15/2020: Case Management Conference Statement

Case Management Conference Statement

12/07/2020: Case Management Conference Statement

Answer

10/05/2020: Answer

Answer

09/28/2020: Answer

Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt

09/08/2020: Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt

09/08/2020: Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt

09/08/2020: Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service Summons

09/08/2020: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

09/08/2020: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

09/08/2020: Proof of Service Summons

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

08/04/2020: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Summons

08/04/2020: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/04/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

08/04/2020: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • FinancialB & H Custom Homes, LLC; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-25118; B & H Custom Homes, LLC; $1305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • FinancialB & H Custom Homes, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $1305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • FinancialKrotik, Andrew; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-25001; Krotik, Andrew; $1305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • FinancialKrotik, Andrew; Transaction Assessment; $1305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • FinancialHeffington, Christopher; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-19910; Heffington, Christopher; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • FinancialHeffington, Christopher; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLDWELL BANKER MALIBU is a litigant