This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 17:12:00 (UTC).

Christina Lemos, Petitioner vs. Manuel Lemos, Respondent

Case Summary

On 05/14/2015 Christina Lemos, Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Manuel Lemos, Respondent. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald and Seymour, Shelly. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1504

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Seymour, Shelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christina Lemos, Petitioner

Defendant

Manuel Lemos, Respondent

 

Court Documents

Restraining Order After Hearing

10/26/2016: Restraining Order After Hearing

Proof of Service

10/25/2016: Proof of Service

Notice: Entry of Judgment

10/06/2016: Notice: Entry of Judgment

Judgment

10/06/2016: Judgment

Request Entry of Default

10/05/2016: Request Entry of Default

Document: Other

10/05/2016: Document: Other

Declaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure

10/05/2016: Declaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure

Declaration: Default/Uncontested Disso

10/05/2016: Declaration: Default/Uncontested Disso

Temporary Restraining Order

09/30/2016: Temporary Restraining Order

Notice Court Hearing

09/30/2016: Notice Court Hearing

Ex Parte Declaration

09/30/2016: Ex Parte Declaration

Request for DVPA with Children (Existing Case)

09/29/2016: Request for DVPA with Children (Existing Case)

Proof of Service Summons

09/06/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Document Return

08/30/2016: Document Return

Declaration Under UCCJEA

08/29/2016: Declaration Under UCCJEA

Declaration

08/29/2016: Declaration

Summons - Filed

08/29/2016: Summons - Filed

Petition: Amended

08/29/2016: Petition: Amended

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2016
  • DocketRequest for Order: Initial; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Judgment Type: Court Judgment; Party; Names; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To; Awarded Against; Comment: see attached image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketRequest Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketRequest for Order: Initial; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To; Awarded Against; Comment: See Attached Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketService of Petition; Served: 05/21/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less