This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 08/20/2021 at 18:02:34 (UTC).

Chase Banks vs Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 Chase Banks filed an Other lawsuit against Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian and Proietti, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2036

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

Proietti, Donald

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Chase Banks

Respondent

Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Eisner, Alexander C

 

Court Documents

Notice

07/20/2021: Notice

44040Declarat03a1276

06/21/2021: 44040Declarat03a1276

44040NoticeCo0236d94

06/21/2021: 44040NoticeCo0236d94

44040CivilCas012f837

06/21/2021: 44040CivilCas012f837

Complaint

06/21/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketPetition; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialChase Banks; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2021-18351; Banks, Chase; $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialChase Banks; Transaction Assessment; $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketLODGED Order/Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF JOSE GUTIERREZ is a litigant

Latest cases where Chase Bank USA NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISNER ALEXANDER C