This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 06:57:07 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs Monique Machado

Case Summary

On 09/25/2017 Cavalry SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Monique Machado. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Bacciarini, Mark. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3222

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Bacciarini, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

Defendant

Machado, Monique M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brar, Ranjeet K.

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution

06/30/2021: Writ of Execution

Memorandum of Costs after Judgment

06/15/2021: Memorandum of Costs after Judgment

Writ of Execution

08/10/2020: Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution

01/06/2020: Writ of Execution

Memorandum

12/18/2019: Memorandum

Writ of Execution

10/04/2019: Writ of Execution

Abstract of Judgment

04/12/2019: Abstract of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment

04/12/2019: Abstract of Judgment

Writ of Execution

02/01/2019: Writ of Execution

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

12/27/2018: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

Judgment Default by Court

08/03/2018: Judgment Default by Court

Declaration

07/30/2018: Declaration

Declaration

07/30/2018: Declaration

Declaration

07/30/2018: Declaration

Declaration

07/30/2018: Declaration

Declaration

07/30/2018: Declaration

Request Dismissal

07/30/2018: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

07/30/2018: Request Entry of Default

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-02429; ABC Legal Services, LLC ACC Blank Account; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs after Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-00086; ABC Legal Services, LLC; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2017-15201; Cavalry SPV I, LLC; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAR RANJEET KAUR