Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 03:00:08 (UTC).

Cavalry Spv I, Llc, vs Jason Fraire

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 Cavalry Spv I, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jason Fraire. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, David. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1878

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cavalry Spv I, Llc,

Citibank, N.A.

Defendant

Fraire, Jason

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tan, Cherrie Y

 

Court Documents

Judgment Default by Court

09/28/2020: Judgment Default by Court

Request

09/21/2020: Request

Memorandum

09/21/2020: Memorandum

Declaration

09/21/2020: Declaration

Declaration

09/21/2020: Declaration

Request Dismissal

09/21/2020: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

09/21/2020: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

07/16/2020: Proof of Service Summons

WinnLaw_20-03103_ven_eABC.pdf

06/29/2020: WinnLaw_20-03103_ven_eABC.pdf

WinnLaw_20-03103_ccs_eABC.pdf

06/29/2020: WinnLaw_20-03103_ccs_eABC.pdf

WinnLaw_20-03103_sum_eABC.pdf

06/29/2020: WinnLaw_20-03103_sum_eABC.pdf

WinnLaw_20-03103_com_eABC.pdf

06/29/2020: WinnLaw_20-03103_com_eABC.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Cavalry Spv I, Llc,; Fraire, Jason; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Cavalry Spv I, Llc,; Awarded Against; Fraire, Jason; Amount; Damages: $5,455.01; Costs: $309.50; Total: $5764.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Foster, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • FinancialCavalry Spv I, Llc,; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-17076; Cavalry Spv I, Llc,; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • FinancialCavalry Spv I, Llc,; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAN CHERRIE Y