This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 07:06:35 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs Frankie Pena

Case Summary

On 12/18/2017 Cavalry SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Frankie Pena. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bacciarini, Mark and Lo, Paul. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4329

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bacciarini, Mark

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

Defendant

Pena, Frankie R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Winn, Brian Nevins

Laura, Hoalst M

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/18/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/18/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

12/18/2017: Summons

Declaration

12/18/2017: Declaration

Other Documents Not Listed

02/28/2018: Other Documents Not Listed

Request Entry of Default

10/03/2018: Request Entry of Default

Request Dismissal

10/03/2018: Request Dismissal

Declaration

10/03/2018: Declaration

Declaration

10/03/2018: Declaration

Memorandum

10/03/2018: Memorandum

Request

10/03/2018: Request

Declaration

10/10/2018: Declaration

Judgment Default by Court

10/10/2018: Judgment Default by Court

Abstract of Judgment

01/11/2019: Abstract of Judgment

Memorandum

05/24/2019: Memorandum

Writ of Execution

06/21/2019: Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution

07/01/2020: Writ of Execution

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-03177; Cavalry SPV I, LLC; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-00273; Cavalry SPV I, LLC; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Cavalry SPV I, LLC; Pena, Frankie R; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Cavalry SPV I, LLC; Awarded Against; Pena, Frankie R; Amount; Damages: $6,500.09; Costs: $334.00; Total: $6834.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2017-20517; Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of CITIBANK, N.A.,; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINN BRIAN N. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOALST LAURA MCCARTHY