This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/09/2020 at 22:47:39 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs Christina Moreno

Case Summary

On 11/16/2017 Cavalry SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Christina Moreno. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foster, David and Lo, Paul. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3984

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foster, David

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

Citibank, N.A.

Defendant

Moreno, Christina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Burrows, Jason M

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution

03/23/2020: Writ of Execution

Memorandum

03/12/2020: Memorandum

Writ of Execution

12/09/2019: Writ of Execution

Abstract of Judgment

11/25/2019: Abstract of Judgment

Memorandum

11/20/2019: Memorandum

Judgment Default by Court

11/06/2019: Judgment Default by Court

Request

11/04/2019: Request

Memorandum

11/04/2019: Memorandum

Declaration

11/04/2019: Declaration

Declaration

11/04/2019: Declaration

Request Dismissal

11/04/2019: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

11/04/2019: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

10/23/2018: Proof of Service Summons

Notice

01/12/2018: Notice

Declaration

11/16/2017: Declaration

Summons

11/16/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/16/2017: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-01658; Winn Law Group, APC; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-06462; Winn Law Group, APC; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-06233; Winn Law Group, APC; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2017-18795; Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of CITIBANK N.A.,; $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • FinancialCavalry SPV I, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURROWS JASON M.