Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 16:45:08 (UTC).

Castle Atwater, LLC vs. Sharee Frazier, et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2016 Castle Atwater, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Sharee Frazier. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian and Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0107

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Castle Atwater, LLC

Defendants

Fraizier, Edwards

Frazier, Edward

Frazier, Sharee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Newman, William A

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession

02/17/2016: Writ of Possession

Judgment Default by Court

02/11/2016: Judgment Default by Court

Writ of Possession

02/09/2016: Writ of Possession

Affidavit

02/08/2016: Affidavit

Judgment Default by Clerk

02/08/2016: Judgment Default by Clerk

Request Dismissal

02/08/2016: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

02/08/2016: Request Entry of Default

Request Entry of Default

01/25/2016: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

01/25/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

01/25/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

01/25/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Order

01/20/2016: Order

Request

01/20/2016: Request

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

01/20/2016: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

Summons - Filed

01/14/2016: Summons - Filed

Complaint

01/14/2016: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/14/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • FinancialCastle Atwater, LLC; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-01540; Castle Atwater, LLC; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • FinancialCastle Atwater, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; Castle Atwater, LLC; Frazier, Sharee; Fraizier, Edwards; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2016
  • FinancialCastle Atwater, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • FinancialCastle Atwater, LLC; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-00357; Legal Support Net, Inc; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • FinancialCastle Atwater, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Castle Atwater, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Newman, William A