This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 07:13:22 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs Ester Anderson

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Capital One Bank USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ester Anderson. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bacciarini, Mark. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3370

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bacciarini, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Anderson, Ester M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bleier, Elizabeth A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

08/24/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/24/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

08/24/2018: Summons

Declaration

08/24/2018: Declaration

Request Entry of Default

12/06/2018: Request Entry of Default

Request Dismissal

12/06/2018: Request Dismissal

Judgment Default by Clerk

12/06/2018: Judgment Default by Clerk

Proof of Service Summons

12/06/2018: Proof of Service Summons

Declaration

12/06/2018: Declaration

Declaration

12/06/2018: Declaration

Declaration

12/06/2018: Declaration

Abstract of Judgment

12/26/2018: Abstract of Judgment

Memorandum

08/02/2019: Memorandum

Notice of Change of Firm Name

10/15/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Acknowlegment

10/15/2019: Acknowlegment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowlegment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • FinancialAnderson, Ester M; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-03972; Joe Acevedo; $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • FinancialAnderson, Ester M; Transaction Assessment; $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • FinancialCapital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-00007; Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • FinancialCapital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Anderson, Ester M; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against; Anderson, Ester M; Amount; Damages: $14,500.70; Costs: $440.00; Total: $14940.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • FinancialCapital One Bank (USA), N.A.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2018-17735; Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • FinancialCapital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Transaction Assessment; $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bleier, Elizabeth A