This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/30/2020 at 01:27:45 (UTC).

Candy Ramirez, Petitioner vs. Alex Ramirez,Respondent

Case Summary

On 05/29/2015 Candy Ramirez, Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Alex Ramirez,Respondent. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Seymour, Shelly. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1659

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Seymour, Shelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Candy Ramirez, Petitioner

Defendant

Alex Ramirez,Respondent

 

Court Documents

* Public *

11/09/2015: * Public *

* Public *

06/26/2015: * Public *

* Public *

06/19/2015: * Public *

* Public *

06/02/2015: * Public *

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

06/01/2015: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service Summons

06/01/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

05/29/2015: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Declaration Under UCCJEA

05/29/2015: Declaration Under UCCJEA

Petition

05/29/2015: Petition

Summons - Filed

05/29/2015: Summons - Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Judgment Type: Dismissal; Party; Names; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketService of Petition; Served: 05/31/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less