This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 06:40:57 (UTC).

Cach, LLC vs Luis Lopez

Case Summary

On 11/13/2015 Cach, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Luis Lopez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3289

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

Lopez, Luis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mondia, Marie

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address

09/28/2020: Notice of Change of Address

Document Return Form

10/07/2019: Document Return Form

Notice of Change of Address

09/26/2019: Notice of Change of Address

Memorandum

09/26/2019: Memorandum

120022962724_proposed.pdf

04/12/2016: 120022962724_proposed.pdf

120022962724_copy.pdf

04/12/2016: 120022962724_copy.pdf

120022962724_1033.pdf

04/12/2016: 120022962724_1033.pdf

120022962724_dec_in_sppt.pdf

04/12/2016: 120022962724_dec_in_sppt.pdf

120022962724_585.pdf

04/12/2016: 120022962724_585.pdf

120022962724_does.pdf

04/12/2016: 120022962724_does.pdf

120022962724_req_for_def.pdf

04/12/2016: 120022962724_req_for_def.pdf

Proof of Service Summons

01/15/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Declaration

12/30/2015: Declaration

Declaration

11/25/2015: Declaration

Declaration

11/13/2015: Declaration

Complaint

11/13/2015: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Filed

11/13/2015: Summons - Filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • FinancialCach, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-05253; ABC Legal Services, Inc,; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • FinancialCach, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Return Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; Cach, LLC; Lopez, Luis; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Cach, LLC; Awarded Against; Lopez, Luis; Judgment Amount: $13,012.06; Amount; Damages: $11,777.56; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $10.00; Attorney Fees: $800.00; Costs: $434.50; Total: $13022.06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • FinancialCach, LLC; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-10538; ABC Legal Services, Inc.; $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • FinancialCach, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Cach, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP - MARIE MONDIA SB