This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 14:23:48 (UTC).

Brandy Avery vs. Daniel Avery

Case Summary

On 12/03/2015 Brandy Avery filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Daniel Avery. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Seymour, Shelly, McCabe, Brian, Shaver, Donald, Wakefield, Catherine, Lincoln, Sue and Dougherty, Frank. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3484

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Seymour, Shelly

McCabe, Brian

Shaver, Donald

Wakefield, Catherine

Lincoln, Sue

Dougherty, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandy Avery

Defendant

Daniel Avery

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

07/02/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

06/13/2018: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Mail

11/28/2017: Proof of Service by Mail

Finding and Order After Hearing

11/22/2017: Finding and Order After Hearing

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

11/20/2017: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Declaration

11/16/2017: Declaration

General Notice of Hearing

08/21/2017: General Notice of Hearing

Objections

08/21/2017: Objections

Certificate of Mailing

07/28/2017: Certificate of Mailing

Declaration

07/13/2017: Declaration

Proof of Service by Mail

04/14/2017: Proof of Service by Mail

Finding and Order After Hearing

04/12/2017: Finding and Order After Hearing

General Notice of Hearing

02/14/2017: General Notice of Hearing

General Notice of Hearing

02/14/2017: General Notice of Hearing

Certificate of Mailing

08/31/2016: Certificate of Mailing

Order

08/31/2016: Order

Child Custody Recommending Counseling -Recommendat

07/08/2016: Child Custody Recommending Counseling -Recommendat

Declaration Under UCCJEA

12/24/2015: Declaration Under UCCJEA

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinding and Order After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinding and Order After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChild Custody Recommending Counseling -Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinding and Order After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCCRC Review; Judicial Officer: Wakefield, Catherine; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: CCRC Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Change of Address/Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponsive Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order:Modification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketTransfer In: Confidential Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransfer In: Public Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less