This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 18:01:53 (UTC).

BMO Harris Bank N.A. vs Rupinder Gakhal

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 BMO Harris Bank N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Rupinder Gakhal. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2274

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMO Harris Bank N.A.

Defendants

Gakhal, Rupinder Singh

Gakhal, Rupinder S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ito, Ken I

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

07/06/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

Summons.pdf

07/06/2021: Summons.pdf

Complaint.pdf

07/06/2021: Complaint.pdf

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

07/20/2021: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Proof of Service Summons

07/30/2021: Proof of Service Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • FinancialBMO Harris Bank N.A.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2021-20568; BMO Harris Bank N.A.; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • FinancialBMO Harris Bank N.A.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ITO KEN I.