This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 11:43:45 (UTC).

Barclays Bank Delaware vs Jose Rojas

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 Barclays Bank Delaware filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jose Rojas. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacobs, Harry. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1608

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jacobs, Harry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barclays Bank Delaware

Defendant

Rojas, Jose G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kennard, Robert Scott

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution

04/02/2020: Writ of Execution

Document Return Form

08/22/2018: Document Return Form

Writ of Execution

06/07/2018: Writ of Execution

Memorandum

06/07/2018: Memorandum

Abstract of Judgment

03/05/2018: Abstract of Judgment

Judgment Default by Clerk

03/15/2017: Judgment Default by Clerk

Request Dismissal

03/15/2017: Request Dismissal

Declaration

03/15/2017: Declaration

Request Entry of Default

03/15/2017: Request Entry of Default

Other Documents Not Listed

01/18/2017: Other Documents Not Listed

proof of service

01/10/2017: proof of service

Affidavit

12/06/2016: Affidavit

Affidavit

10/20/2016: Affidavit

Declaration

09/19/2016: Declaration

Declaration

07/20/2016: Declaration

Summons

06/06/2016: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/06/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

06/06/2016: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Return Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • FinancialBarclays Bank Delaware; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2018-03311; Law Offices of Nelson & Kennard; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • FinancialBarclays Bank Delaware; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • FinancialBarclays Bank Delaware; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2018-01224; Kennard, Robert Scott; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • FinancialBarclays Bank Delaware; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; Barclays Bank Delaware; Rojas, Jose G; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Barclays Bank Delaware; Awarded Against; Rojas, Jose G; Judgment Amount: $2,703.30; Amount; Damages: $2,187.35; Costs: $515.95; Total: $2703.30

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • FinancialBarclays Bank Delaware; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-07210; Barclays Bank Delaware; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • FinancialBarclays Bank Delaware; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barclays Bank Delaware is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard