This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 07:17:56 (UTC).

Bank of Stockton vs Jack Stanton

Case Summary

On 08/24/2017 Bank of Stockton filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jack Stanton. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bacciarini, Mark and Lo, Paul. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2923

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bacciarini, Mark

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of Stockton

Defendant

Stanton, Jack David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross, David K

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/24/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

08/24/2017: Summons

Complaint

08/24/2017: Complaint

Notice of CMC

09/07/2017: Notice of CMC

Proof of Service Summons

10/25/2017: Proof of Service Summons

Request Dismissal

10/25/2017: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

10/25/2017: Request Entry of Default

Affidavit

10/25/2017: Affidavit

Judgment Default by Court

11/22/2017: Judgment Default by Court

Abstract of Judgment

12/13/2017: Abstract of Judgment

Application for OEX

01/09/2018: Application for OEX

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

03/28/2018: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Examination (Non Appeal); Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • FinancialBank of Stockton; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2018-00835; Bank of Stockton; $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • FinancialBank of Stockton; Transaction Assessment; $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for OEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • FinancialBank of Stockton; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-06460; Bank of Stockton; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • FinancialBank of Stockton; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Bank of Stockton; Stanton, Jack David; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Bank of Stockton; Awarded Against; Stanton, Jack David; Amount; Damages: $5,614.62; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 7.49 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $92.30; Attorney Fees: $530.73; Costs: $300.00; Total: $6537.65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • FinancialBank of Stockton; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2017-13712; Bank of Stockton; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • FinancialBank of Stockton; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BANK OF STOCKTON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSS, DAVID K