This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 06:43:08 (UTC).

Bank of Stockton vs Beatriz Avila

Case Summary

On 05/29/2015 Bank of Stockton filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Beatriz Avila. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirihara, John and Bacciarini, Mark. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1576

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirihara, John

Bacciarini, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of Stockton

Defendant

Avila, Beatriz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross, David K

 

Court Documents

Summons - Filed

05/29/2015: Summons - Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/29/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

05/29/2015: Complaint

Proof of Service Summons

08/17/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Request Entry of Default

09/18/2015: Request Entry of Default

Request Dismissal

09/18/2015: Request Dismissal

Declaration

09/18/2015: Declaration

Affidavit

09/18/2015: Affidavit

Judgment Default by Court

10/01/2015: Judgment Default by Court

Document Return Form

10/08/2015: Document Return Form

Abstract of Judgment

10/23/2015: Abstract of Judgment

Document Return Form

11/13/2015: Document Return Form

Memorandum

12/01/2015: Memorandum

Writ of Execution

12/01/2015: Writ of Execution

Application and Order for Examination

02/10/2016: Application and Order for Examination

Writ of Execution

11/09/2016: Writ of Execution

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • DocketOrder of Examination (Non Appeal); Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • FinancialBank of Stockton; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-01142; David K. Ross; $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • FinancialBank of Stockton; Transaction Assessment; $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • FinancialBank of Stockton; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-11040; Ross, David K; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • FinancialBank of Stockton; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Return Form

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • FinancialBank of Stockton; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-05027; David K Ross; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • FinancialBank of Stockton; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Bank of Stockton; Served: 07/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BANK OF STOCKTON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSS, DAVID K