Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 12:11:54 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. vs Kulwinder Samra

Case Summary

On 10/30/2018 Bank of America, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kulwinder Samra. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bacciarini, Mark and Foster, David. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4438

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bacciarini, Mark

Foster, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America, N.A.

Defendant

Samra, Kulwinder Singh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zide, Flint C

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution

04/17/2020: Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution

10/21/2019: Writ of Execution

Memorandum

10/01/2019: Memorandum

3038516_606TA016217I

10/01/2019: 3038516_606TA016217I

3038516_566TA016217D

10/01/2019: 3038516_566TA016217D

Judgment Default by Court

02/28/2019: Judgment Default by Court

2510285_048TA016217_

02/27/2019: 2510285_048TA016217_

2510285_732TA016217_

02/27/2019: 2510285_732TA016217_

2510285_072TA016217_

02/27/2019: 2510285_072TA016217_

Request Dismissal

02/27/2019: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

02/27/2019: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

11/13/2018: Proof of Service Summons

Declaration

10/30/2018: Declaration

Summons

10/30/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/30/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/30/2018: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • FinancialBank of America, N.A.; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-05537; Law Office of Harris & Zide; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • FinancialBank of America, N.A.; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Bank of America, N.A.; Samra, Kulwinder Singh; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Bank of America, N.A.; Awarded Against; Samra, Kulwinder Singh; Amount; Damages: $12,930.51; Costs: $439.50; Total: $13370.01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Foster, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • FinancialBank of America, N.A.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2018-23053; Bank of America, N.A.; $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • FinancialBank of America, N.A.; Transaction Assessment; $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HARRIS & ZIDE - FLINT C. ZIDE