This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 07:30:30 (UTC).

Bank Of America, N.A. vs Erika Reyes

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Bank Of America, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Erika Reyes. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Merced County Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Moranda, David. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2410

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Moranda, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America, N.A.

Defendant

Reyes, Erika M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kennard, Robert Scott

Sleezer, Kristen

 

Court Documents

Complaint

06/13/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

06/13/2019: Summons

Proof of Service Summons

06/28/2019: Proof of Service Summons

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

07/15/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Answer

07/15/2019: Answer

Proof of Service

07/25/2019: Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Motion

05/19/2020: Motion

Declaration

05/19/2020: Declaration

Memorandum:Points and Authorities

05/19/2020: Memorandum:Points and Authorities

Notice

05/22/2020: Notice

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

06/30/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Order

06/30/2020: Order

Notice

09/21/2020: Notice

Request Dismissal

07/14/2021: Request Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Judgment Type: Dismissal; Party; Names; Bank Of America, N.A.; Reyes, Erika M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Original Type: Motion; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Reyes, Erika M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • FinancialBank Of America, N.A.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-13651; Bank Of America, N.A.; $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • FinancialBank Of America, N.A.; Transaction Assessment; $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum: Points and Authorities

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • FinancialReyes, Erika M; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2019-06554; Reyes, Erika M; $2.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • FinancialReyes, Erika M; Transaction Assessment; $2.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • FinancialBank Of America, N.A.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-14014; Bank Of America, N.A.; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • FinancialBank Of America, N.A.; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLEEZER KRISTEN