This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 07:19:47 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. vs Alejandra Aranda

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 Bank of America, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Alejandra Aranda. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bacciarini, Mark. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2235

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bacciarini, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America, N.A.

Defendant

Aranda, Alejandra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brodbeck, Lori

 

Court Documents

Satisfication of Judgment

03/08/2021: Satisfication of Judgment

Writ of Execution

06/29/2020: Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution

10/21/2019: Writ of Execution

Memorandum

10/01/2019: Memorandum

Declaration

10/01/2019: Declaration

3038485_919TA008983D

10/01/2019: 3038485_919TA008983D

Abstract of Judgment

09/23/2019: Abstract of Judgment

2254371_418TA008983_

11/05/2018: 2254371_418TA008983_

2254371_113TA008983_

11/05/2018: 2254371_113TA008983_

2254371_601TA008983_

11/05/2018: 2254371_601TA008983_

2254371_104TA008983_

11/05/2018: 2254371_104TA008983_

Request Dismissal

11/05/2018: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

11/05/2018: Request Entry of Default

Judgment Default by Clerk

11/05/2018: Judgment Default by Clerk

Proof of Service Summons

06/27/2018: Proof of Service Summons

Declaration

06/08/2018: Declaration

Summons

06/08/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/08/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • FinancialBank of America, N.A.; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-05539; Law Office of Harris & Zide; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • FinancialBank of America, N.A.; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialBank of America, N.A.; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-04939; Law Office of Harris & Zide; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialBank of America, N.A.; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • FinancialBank of America, N.A.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2018-11766; Bank of America, N.A.; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • FinancialBank of America, N.A.; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brodbeck, Lori Denise