Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/06/2020 at 21:06:20 (UTC).

Artemio Cisneros vs. Magaly Robles

Case Summary

On 07/26/2016 Artemio Cisneros filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Magaly Robles. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacobs, Harry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2200

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jacobs, Harry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cisneros, Artemio

Defendant

Robles, Magaly

 

Court Documents

Document Return Form

09/21/2016: Document Return Form

Document Return

09/21/2016: Document Return

Request Entry of Default

09/20/2016: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

09/20/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Document Return Form

08/16/2016: Document Return Form

Document Return

08/16/2016: Document Return

Request Entry of Default

08/15/2016: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

08/15/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Returned Mail

08/05/2016: Returned Mail

Request Entry of Default

08/05/2016: Request Entry of Default

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

07/29/2016: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

Summons - Filed

07/26/2016: Summons - Filed

Complaint

07/26/2016: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/26/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Return Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Return Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • FinancialCisneros, Artemio; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-03794; Cisneros, Artemio; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • FinancialCisneros, Artemio; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less