This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/06/2021 at 00:28:09 (UTC).

Anthony Freeman vs Yasser Abdoun, et al.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 Anthony Freeman filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Yasser Abdoun. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1812

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freeman, Anthony

Defendants

Abdoun, Yasser

Raymond, Brian Jeffrey

Mendoza, Alifonso

Premier Lending Services, Inc.

American Realty

Coldwell Banker Commercial Gonella

Yasser Abdoun Living Trust dated October 10 2003

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butler, David, Junior

 

Court Documents

Request Dismissal

10/06/2020: Request Dismissal

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

06/23/2020: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

2020_06_22_15_59_45.pdf

06/22/2020: 2020_06_22_15_59_45.pdf

SUMMONS.pdf

06/22/2020: SUMMONS.pdf

2020_06_22_16_06_42.pdf

06/22/2020: 2020_06_22_16_06_42.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal; Party; Names; Freeman, Anthony; Abdoun, Yasser; Mendoza, Alifonso; Raymond, Brian Jeffrey; Premier Lending Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • FinancialFreeman, Anthony; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-16498; Freeman, Anthony; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • FinancialFreeman, Anthony; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLDWELL BANKER MALIBU is a litigant