This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 18:10:03 (UTC).

American Academy Holdings, Inc. vs Global Aerospace Insurance Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 American Academy Holdings, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Global Aerospace Insurance Services, Inc. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2448

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Academy Holdings, Inc.

Defendants

Global

Global Aerospace Insurance Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hannon, John P., III

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

08/25/2020: Summons

Complaint

08/25/2020: Complaint

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

09/02/2020: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Notice of CMC

03/08/2021: Notice of CMC

Notice of CMC

03/08/2021: Notice of CMC

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • FinancialAmerican Academy Holdings, Inc.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-21839; American Academy Holdings, Inc.; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • FinancialAmerican Academy Holdings, Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Global++ is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hannon, John P.