This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 18:02:00 (UTC).

Alivia Bontkowski vs David Neal, et al.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Alivia Bontkowski filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against David Neal. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1687

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bontkowski, Alivia

Defendants

Neal, David

Torres, Jacinto

Nava, Osvaldo Torres

Torres Bros Plumbing Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Silva, Michael Joe

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/14/2021: Complaint

Summons

05/14/2021: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

05/28/2021: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Proof of Service Summons

06/09/2021: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

06/09/2021: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

06/09/2021: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

06/09/2021: Proof of Service Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialBontkowski, Alivia; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2021-15724; Bontkowski, Alivia; $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialBontkowski, Alivia; Transaction Assessment; $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silva, Michael Joe