This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/19/2020 at 12:03:28 (UTC).

A-L Financial Corp. vs Aaliyah Wilkinson

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 A-L Financial Corp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Aaliyah Wilkinson. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, David. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0792

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L Financial Corp.

Defendant

Wilkinson, Aaliyah

 

Court Documents

Claim - Plaintiff

02/21/2019: Claim - Plaintiff

Proof of Service

03/18/2019: Proof of Service

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

04/05/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Authorization to Appear

04/05/2019: Authorization to Appear

Notice of Entry of Judgment

04/16/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Certificate of Mailing

04/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing

Returned Mail

05/29/2019: Returned Mail

Application and Order for Examination

01/08/2020: Application and Order for Examination

Proof of Service

02/03/2020: Proof of Service

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

02/19/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Authorization to Appear

02/19/2020: Authorization to Appear

Warrant

02/21/2020: Warrant

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWarrant; Judicial Officer: Foster, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Examination (Non Appeal); Original Type: Order of Examination (Non Appeal); Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: A-L Financial Corp.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Examination; Judicial Officer: Foster, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialA-L Financial Corp.; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-00097; A-L Financial Corp.; $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialA-L Financial Corp.; Transaction Assessment; $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; A-L Financial Corp.; Wilkinson, Aaliyah; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; A-L Financial Corp.; Awarded Against; Wilkinson, Aaliyah; Judgment Amount: $1,977.75; Amount; Damages: $1,977.75; Costs: $85.00; Total: $2062.75; Status: Active; Status Date: 04/05/2019; Status Comment: Plus Costs: $50.00 filing fee $35.00 service fee; Status Comment: Plus Costs: $50.00 filing fee $35.00 service fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: A-L Financial Corp.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • FinancialA-L Financial Corp.; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-00955; A-L Financial Corp.; $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • FinancialA-L Financial Corp.; Transaction Assessment; $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim - Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A-L FINANCIAL CORP is a litigant