Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 13:24:54 (UTC).

1953 Shadowbrook LLC vs. Quaid Strange, et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2015 1953 Shadowbrook LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Quaid Strange. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bacciarini, Mark, Dougherty, Frank and Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3540

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bacciarini, Mark

Dougherty, Frank

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1953 Shadowbrook LLC

Defendants

Romero, Angela

Strange, Quaid

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wallace, Rickey D

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession

01/21/2016: Writ of Possession

Writ of Possession

01/14/2016: Writ of Possession

Stipulated Judgment

01/14/2016: Stipulated Judgment

Unlawful Detainer Judgment Summary Sheet

01/06/2016: Unlawful Detainer Judgment Summary Sheet

Notice of Court Trial

12/24/2015: Notice of Court Trial

Notice of Court Trial

12/24/2015: Notice of Court Trial

Request to Set

12/24/2015: Request to Set

Proof of Service Summons

12/24/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

12/24/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service

12/16/2015: Proof of Service

Answer

12/16/2015: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

12/16/2015: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Proof of Service

12/16/2015: Proof of Service

Answer

12/16/2015: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

12/16/2015: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Summons - Filed

12/09/2015: Summons - Filed

Complaint

12/09/2015: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/09/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • FinancialRomero, Angela; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-04576; Romero, Angela; $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • FinancialRomero, Angela; Transaction Assessment; $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment; Party; Names; 1953 Shadowbrook LLC; Strange, Quaid; Romero, Angela; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Financial1953 Shadowbrook LLC; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-00352; Merced County Eviction Service; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Financial1953 Shadowbrook LLC; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulated Judgment; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Judgment Summary Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial: Unlawful Detainer; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Romero, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Financial1953 Shadowbrook LLC; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-11250; Merced County Eviction Service; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Financial1953 Shadowbrook LLC; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: 1953 Shadowbrook LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wallace, Rickey D