Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 11:17:00 (UTC).

WOODARD, CHARLES ARTHUR

Case Summary

On 04/09/1996 WOODARD, CHARLES ARTHUR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/1996

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

WOODARD, CHARLES ARTHUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 071; Event: VERDICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: 987.8 - ATTORNEY FEES PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 071; Event: JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 273.5(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Acquitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 071; Event: JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 071; Event: JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 071; Event: JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 071; Event: COMMENCEMENT OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 071; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/1996
  • BailRECEIPT/BOND NUMBER: MT41911; Surety Company: NATL AUTO & CAS INS; Bond Agent: GLASSER BROS. BAIL; Register Number: 36106002; Amount of Bail: 20000.00; Apperance Date: April 29, 1996; Bail Activity: April 29, 1996: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: May 9, 1996: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: May 9, 1996: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: May 9, 1996: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: May 10, 1996: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: May 10, 1996: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: May 13, 1996: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: May 14, 1996: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: May 14, 1996: Exonerated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 273.5(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less