This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2021 at 01:19:25 (UTC).

WIZAR, ARTHUR JOHN

Case Summary

On 07/14/1998 WIZAR, ARTHUR JOHN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse West located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/1998

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

WIZAR, ARTHUR JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 100; Event: HEARING ON PETN REHAB & PARDON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 100; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2002
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: PACE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2001
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWR; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2001
  • DispositionCharge Section: 11351; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2001
  • DispositionCharge Section: 11350(A); Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2001
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 02; JAIL TERM: 5 YEAR(S) IN ANY STATE PRISON; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2001
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWR; Event: HABEAS CORPUS PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2001
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWR; Event: HABEAS CORPUS PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2001
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWR; Event: HABEAS CORPUS PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/1998
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWR; Event: JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/1998
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWE; Event: JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/1998
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWE; Event: JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/1998
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWE; Event: JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/1998
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWE; Event: JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/1998
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWE; Event: JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/1998
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWE; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/1998
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWE; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/1998
  • DocketCharge Section: 11351; Plea: Nolo Contendere

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/1998
  • DocketCharge Section: 11350(A)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less