This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2021 at 23:08:06 (UTC).

WHEELER, RAT DALE

Case Summary

On 11/09/1993 WHEELER, RAT DALE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Catalina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********7-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/1993

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

WHEELER, RAT DALE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/1998
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/1998
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOK; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/1995
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01; JAIL TERM: 3 YEAR(S) IN ANY STATE PRISON; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOK; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOK; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOK; Event: MISCELLANEOUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOK; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOK; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOK; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/1994
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: BENCH WARRANT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/1994
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: BENCH WARRANT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/1994
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/1994
  • DispositionCharge Section: 11377(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/1994
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOF; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/1994
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/1994
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/1994
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/1993
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOC; Event: PRETRIAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/1993
  • DocketCharge Section: 11377(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less