Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 09:38:12 (UTC).

TORRES, ABEL CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 02/14/1996 TORRES, ABEL CHAVEZ was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********7-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/1996

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

TORRES, ABEL CHAVEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2000
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: COL; Event: PROOF: RESTITUTION FINE PAYMNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2000
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: PROOF OF AA MEETING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 12500(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23152(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/1996
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 02; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: SUMMARY PROBATION 60 MONTH(S); JAIL TERM: 96 HOUR(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $510.00; (OR) Jail term instead of fine: 17 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; ALCOHOL PROGRAM: DEFENDANT SHALL PARTICIPATE IN ANY PROGRAM OF TREATMENT OR COUNSELING AS DIRECTED PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11837 (18-MONTH PROGRAM).; LICENSE RESTRICTION/SUSPENSION: RESTRICT DRIVING FOR 18 MONTH(S) TO AND FROM WORK, TO AND FROM PROGRAM, DURING WORK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 12500(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less