This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2021 at 12:55:08 (UTC).

STOLTMAN, SCOTT ALLEN

Case Summary

On 01/12/1996 STOLTMAN, SCOTT ALLEN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse West located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********4-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/1996

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

STOLTMAN, SCOTT ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 666; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: JURY TRIAL TRAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: JURY TRIAL TRAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: PRETRIAL CONF/TRIAL SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: PRETRIAL CONF/TRIAL SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: PRETRIAL CONF/TRIAL SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWE; Event: PRETRIAL CONF/TRIAL SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWE; Event: PRETRIAL CONF/TRIAL SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 666

    Read MoreRead Less