This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/30/2021 at 05:07:07 (UTC).

SMITH, ANTHONY DYRONE

Case Summary

On 10/25/1995 SMITH, ANTHONY DYRONE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Catalina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/1995

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

SMITH, ANTHONY DYRONE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 56W; Event: JUDICIAL ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 100; Event: PTN RE: 1170.126 PC FILED/RCVD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: PTN RE: 1170.126 PC FILED/RCVD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 56W; Event: JUDICIAL ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/1999
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/1998
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: REMITTITUR FILED-AFFIRMED FULL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/1998
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/1996
  • DocketLocation: Pomona Courthouse South; Dept/Room Number: EAJ; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/1996
  • DocketLocation: Pomona Courthouse South; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/1996
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01; JAIL TERM: 25 YEAR(S) TO LIFE IMPRISONMENT; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/1996
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOB; Event: JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/1996
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOB; Event: JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/1996
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOB; Event: JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/1996
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOB; Event: JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/1996
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOJ; Event: JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/1996
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOB; Event: JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/1995
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOB; Event: JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/1995
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOB; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/1995
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOB; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/1995
  • DocketCharge Section: 12021(A)(1); Plea: Not Guilty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less