Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 16:04:34 (UTC).

RUIZ, JESUS

Case Summary

On 07/26/1996 RUIZ, JESUS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/1996

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

RUIZ, JESUS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: COL; Event: FINES/FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: COL; Event: FINES/FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: PROOF OF MISCELLANEOUS ITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23103; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 14601.1(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23152(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/1996
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 04; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: SUMMARY PROBATION 24 MONTH(S); BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $840.00; (OR) Jail term instead of fine: 28 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; PROGRAM: CAL TRANS 28 DAY(S); PROGRAM INSTEAD OF FINE: JAIL OR FINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 23103; Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 14601.1(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less