This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 08:55:25 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, SAUL

Case Summary

On 01/29/1996 RODRIGUEZ, SAUL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********6-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/1996

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, SAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: FINES/FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: FINES/FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: PROOF OF MISCELLANEOUS ITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: PROOF OF MISCELLANEOUS ITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 273A(B); Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 12500(A); Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23152(A); Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1996
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 02; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: SUMMARY PROBATION 36 MONTH(S); JAIL TERM: 48 HOUR(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $390.00; (OR) Jail term instead of fine: 13 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; PROGRAM: CAL TRANS 11 DAY(S); PROGRAM INSTEAD OF FINE: JAIL OR FINE; ALCOHOL PROGRAM: THE DEFENDANT SHALL ENROLL AND PARTICIPATE IN AND SUCCESSFULLY COMPLETE A 3-MONTH LICENSED FIRST-OFFENDER ALCOHOL AND OTHER DRUG EDUCATION AND COUNSELING PROGRAM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 273A(B)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 12500(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(A)

    Read MoreRead Less