Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2021 at 03:00:52 (UTC).

ROBINSON, ERIC FRANK

Case Summary

On 10/18/1991 ROBINSON, ERIC FRANK was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Catalina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5-02

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/1991

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Catalina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROBINSON, ERIC FRANK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: PETN PER 1170.95(A)PC RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S11; Event: JUDICIAL ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S11; Event: PTN WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RCVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S24; Event: JUDICIAL ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S11; Event: PTN WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RCVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S06; Event: JUDICIAL ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S24; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 100; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S01; Event: HABEAS CORPUS PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S01; Event: COURT CONSIDERATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S18; Event: HABEAS CORPUS PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S01; Event: COURT CONSIDERATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2004
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: EXHIBIT DISPOSAL LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/1999
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOJ; Event: MISCELLANEOUS

    Read MoreRead Less