Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 17:46:44 (UTC).

RINCON, MIGUEL

Case Summary

On 10/11/1996 RINCON, MIGUEL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********9-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/1996

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

RINCON, MIGUEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2001
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/1999
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: PROOF: IGNITION INTERLOCK DVIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/1999
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: PROOF OF DUI SCHOOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/1998
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: BENCH WARRANT HOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/1998
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/1998
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: PROOF OF DUI SCHOOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: PROOF OF AA MEETING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: PROOF OF MISCELLANEOUS ITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: PROOF OF MISCELLANEOUS ITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23152(A); Plea: PLead Guilty; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/1996
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: SUMMARY PROBATION 60 MONTH(S); JAIL TERM: 48 HOUR(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $510.00; (OR) Jail term instead of fine: 17 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; ALCOHOL PROGRAM: DEFENDANT SHALL PARTICIPATE IN ANY PROGRAM OF TREATMENT OR COUNSELING AS DIRECTED PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11837 (18-MONTH PROGRAM).; LICENSE RESTRICTION/SUSPENSION: RESTRICT DRIVING FOR 18 MONTH(S) TO AND FROM WORK, TO AND FROM PROGRAM, DURING WORK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/1996
  • BailRECEIPT/BOND NUMBER: R510392760; Surety Company: RANGER INSURANCE CO.; Bond Agent: EDDIE NARDONI BAILBD; Register Number: 36309022; Amount of Bail: 2500.00; Apperance Date: November 18, 1996; Bail Activity: November 14, 1996: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: December 5, 1996: Exonerated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: BAIL REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 14601.2(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(A); Plea: PLead Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less