This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2021 at 09:16:16 (UTC).

POOLER, RICHARD EUGENE

Case Summary

On 11/03/1994 POOLER, RICHARD EUGENE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Catalina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0-02

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/1994

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

POOLER, RICHARD EUGENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: SURRENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: MISCELLANEOUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/1995
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01, 02; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: FORMAL PROBATION 3 YEAR(S); JAIL TERM: 120 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOC; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/1995
  • DispositionCharge Section: 496(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/1995
  • DispositionCharge Section: 496(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: ARRAIGNMENT AND PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1995
  • DispositionCharge Section: 10751(A); Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/1995
  • DispositionCharge Section: 10801; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: ARRAIGNMENT AND PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/1994
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/1994
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/1994
  • DocketCharge Section: 10751(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/1994
  • DocketCharge Section: 10801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/1994
  • DocketCharge Section: 496(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/1994
  • DocketCharge Section: 496(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less