This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2021 at 03:35:13 (UTC).

NEMETH, JANOS TIBOR

Case Summary

On 04/21/1995 NEMETH, JANOS TIBOR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse West located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0-02

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/1995

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

NEMETH, JANOS TIBOR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: APP; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: SURRENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: SENTENCING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/1997
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01; JAIL TERM: 4 YEAR(S) IN ANY STATE PRISON; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: JURY TRIAL TRAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 11352(A); Plea: PLead Guilty; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: TRIAL/1538.5 PC MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: JURY TRIAL TRAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: JURY TRIAL TRAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: PRETRIAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/1995
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWQ; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/1995
  • DocketCharge Section: 11352(A); Plea: PLead Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less