Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 07:46:36 (UTC).

MURPHY, ROBERT JAMES

Case Summary

On 01/12/1996 MURPHY, ROBERT JAMES was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/1996

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

MURPHY, ROBERT JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: PROOF: RESTITUTION FINE PAYMNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: PROOF OF DUI SCHOOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: PROOF OF COMPLETION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: PROOF OF COMPLETION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: SURRENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: SENTENCING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: PRETRIAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 11364; Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 11550(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/1996
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: SUMMARY PROBATION 36 MONTH(S); JAIL TERM: 150 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 11364; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 11550(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less