Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 17:31:05 (UTC).

MORA, DANIEL EDUARDO

Case Summary

On 09/25/1996 MORA, DANIEL EDUARDO was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********4-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/1996

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

MORA, DANIEL EDUARDO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/1998
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: PROOF OF CAL TRANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/1998
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 068; Event: PROOF OF MISCELLANEOUS ITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: SURRENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 068; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/1997
  • DispositionCharge Section: 647(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/1997
  • DispositionCharge Section: 314 SUB1; Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/1997
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 02; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: SUMMARY PROBATION 36 MONTH(S); JAIL TERM: 60 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 068; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 065; Event: JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 065; Event: COMMENCEMENT OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 065; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: PRETRIAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 647(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 314 SUB1; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less